NJ A4702 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Hunger-Free Campus Act"; requires Secretary of Higher Education to establish grant program to address food insecurity among students enrolled in public institutions of higher education; appropriates $1 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Hunger-Free Campus Act"; requires Secretary of Higher Education to establish grant program to address food insecurity among students enrolled in public institutions of higher education; appropriates $1 million.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3239 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.89.
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted for S3239 (1R)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (62-8-8)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3239 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4702 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback