NJ A4701 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Approved P.L.2023, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Approved P.L.2023, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Fiscal Year 2024 appropriations act to allocate $25 million from “New Jersey Affordable Housing Trust Fund” to support construction and rehabilitation of low- and moderate-income housing.
Title
Amends Fiscal Year 2024 appropriations act to allocate $25 million from “New Jersey Affordable Housing Trust Fund” to support construction and rehabilitation of low- and moderate-income housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3144 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3144 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.83. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Motion Waive 22:5 (74-0-0)(Pintor Marin) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly on Concurrence |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3144 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3144 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4701