NJ A4690 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands eligibility criteria for municipalities wherein projects receiving New Jersey Redevelopment Authority assistance may occur.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands eligibility criteria for municipalities wherein projects receiving New Jersey Redevelopment Authority assistance may occur.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2021-06-21AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2021-05-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-09-21AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2888 (Same As) 2020-11-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback