NJ S2888 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility criteria for municipalities wherein projects receiving New Jersey Redevelopment Authority assistance may occur.
Title
Expands eligibility criteria for municipalities wherein projects receiving New Jersey Redevelopment Authority assistance may occur.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4690 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee