NJ A4545 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2006
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include instruction on
racial discrimination and social justice as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies for middle school students.
Title
Requires school districts to include instruction on
racial discrimination and social justice as part of implementation of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies for middle school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-7-9) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4545 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2709 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2709 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee