NJ A4521 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1928
Note: Carry Foward to future S1688
Note: Carry Foward to future S1688
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain non-disclosure and non-disparagement provisions in employment contracts.
Title
Prohibits certain non-disclosure and non-disparagement provisions in employment contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-9-4) |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4521 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A4521 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2930 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A4521 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2930 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee