NJ A450 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3551
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-15)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-15)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wounded Warrior Caregivers Relief Act; Provides income tax credit to family caregivers of certain armed service members with physical disabilities.
Title
Wounded Warrior Caregivers Relief Act; Provides income tax credit to family caregivers of certain armed service members with physical disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S750 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.67. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted for S750 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3551 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S750 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A450
S750 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A450