NJ A4485 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates personal protective equipment to long-term care facilities, home health agencies, hospice care providers, health care service firms, PACE programs, and certain community-based providers during public health emergency.
Title
Dedicates personal protective equipment to long-term care facilities, home health agencies, hospice care providers, health care service firms, PACE programs, and certain community-based providers during public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2784 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)