NJ A4446 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of pet presence in seasonal rental unit.
Title
Requires notification of pet presence in seasonal rental unit.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Victoria Flynn [R] | Rep. Alixon Collazos-Gill [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3390 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee