NJ A4433 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates grant program to encourage school districts to partner with institutions of higher education in training school-based mental health services providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates grant program to encourage school districts to partner with institutions of higher education in training school-based mental health services providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2715 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2021-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2021-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-06-21SenateSubstituted for S2715 (1R)
2021-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2715 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4433 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback