NJ A439 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4448
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to states adopting religious freedom statutes without protection against discrimination.
Title
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to states adopting religious freedom statutes without protection against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4448 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3613 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2043 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A3613 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2043 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A439 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/439_I1.HTM |