NJ S2043 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2870
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to certain states without protections against discrimination based on sex, gender identity or expression, and affectional or sexual orientation.*
Title
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to certain states without protections against discrimination based on sex, gender identity or expression, and affectional or sexual orientation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A439 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2870 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3613 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2870 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3613 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading