NJ A4385 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3296
Note: Carry Over of previous A4784
Note: Carry Over of previous A4784
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires vehicle identification number be stamped on catalytic converters of motor vehicles.
Title
Requires vehicle identification number be stamped on catalytic converters of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Venezia [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Garnet Hall [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Carmen Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2997 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3296 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4784 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3296 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4784 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4385 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4385_I1.HTM |