NJ S3296 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2997
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires vehicle identification number be stamped on catalytic converters of motor vehicles.
Title
Requires vehicle identification number be stamped on catalytic converters of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3296 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4784 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4784 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading