NJ A4359 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that school district's request for permission to use unrecognized position title include list of abolished positions and positions in which there have been layoffs and detailed job descriptions for them.
Title
Requires that school district's request for permission to use unrecognized position title include list of abolished positions and positions in which there have been layoffs and detailed job descriptions for them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S2716 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4359 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2716
S2716 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2716 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session