NJ A4336 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3465 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3465 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Agriculture to pay annual premiums to enrolled dairy farmers for certain coverage under the federal Dairy Margin Coverage Program; appropriates $125, 000.
Title
Directs Department of Agriculture to pay annual premiums to enrolled dairy farmers for certain coverage under the federal Dairy Margin Coverage Program; appropriates $125, 000.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3465 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3465 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.401.