NJ A4319 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain temporary and permanent privileges for certain alcoholic beverage licensees; authorizes certain activities, events, and festivals in which certain alcoholic beverage licensees may participate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain temporary and permanent privileges for certain alcoholic beverage licensees; authorizes certain activities, events, and festivals in which certain alcoholic beverage licensees may participate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2020-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (58-8-7)
2020-06-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback