NJ A4282 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides nursing home residents with right to timely response to certain complaints, concerns, or requests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides nursing home residents with right to timely response to certain complaints, concerns, or requests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-1)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-06-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2480 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback