NJ A4253 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "New Jersey Nonprofit Security Grant Pilot Program." **

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "New Jersey Nonprofit Security Grant Pilot Program." **

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2634 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-1-0)
2017-07-31Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2017-07-31AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2017-07-31AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2017-06-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2634 (1R)
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-03-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (61-10-3)
2017-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-01-19AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-10-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2634 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4253 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback