NJ A4251 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special license to allow food and beverage establishments to sell alcoholic beverages in shopping malls.
Title
Establishes special license to allow food and beverage establishments to sell alcoholic beverages in shopping malls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2901 (Same As) 2022-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee