NJ A4232 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.190.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.190.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates pilot program to allow certain county utilities authorities to fund certain local infrastructure.*
Title
Creates pilot program to allow certain county utilities authorities to fund certain local infrastructure.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2844 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2844 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.190. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-12-1) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-25-2) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-11) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2844 (SCS) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-23-1) |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2844 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A4232 (1R)