NJ A4225 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2479 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education and State financial aid.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education and State financial aid.*

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-19AssemblySubstituted by S2479 (2R)
2013-12-12AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2013-12-12AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
2013-06-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-06-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2479 (Same As) 2013-12-20 - Approved P.L.2013, c.170.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback