NJ S2479 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Approved P.L.2013, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Approved P.L.2013, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education.***
Title
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education.***
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 46 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4225 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 46 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4225 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.170. |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-26-1) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Motion Suspend Rule 22:5(Johnson)(60-15-1) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-7) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (31-4) (Ruiz) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (28-7) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-32-2) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (46-32-0) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Rumana) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A4225 (ACS) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-12) |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3509 (Same As) 2012-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4225 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2479 (2R)
A4225 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2479 (2R)