NJ A4224 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires study of safety of school bus passengers in certain emergency situations, including school bus accidents; appropriates $250,000. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires study of safety of school bus passengers in certain emergency situations, including school bus accidents; appropriates $250,000. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2754 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.24.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2018-10-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2754 (2R)
2018-09-27SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Lagana)
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-07-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-07-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-07-26SenateTransferred to Senate Transportation Committee
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-1-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2754 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A4224 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback