NJ A4218 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Lost in the Assembly CVOR (49-29) (Mosquera)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Lost in the Assembly CVOR (49-29) (Mosquera)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain laws concerning domestic violence and firearms.
Title
Revises certain laws concerning domestic violence and firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Veto Override (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Lost in the Assembly CVOR (49-29) (Mosquera) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-1) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2786 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-11-20) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4218 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Lost in the Assembly CVOR (49-29) (Mosquera)
S2786 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4218 (2R)
S2786 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4218 (2R)