NJ A4212 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Substituted by S1760 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Substituted by S1760 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes American Sign Language as a world language for meeting high school graduation requirements.
Title
Recognizes American Sign Language as a world language for meeting high school graduation requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mary Angelini [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S1760 (1R) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1760 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.87.