NJ A4191 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for swimming pools to comply with certain regulations concerning lifeguards, inspections, and circulation systems.
Title
Revises requirements for swimming pools to comply with certain regulations concerning lifeguards, inspections, and circulation systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2661 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.23. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2661 (1R) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2661 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4191