NJ A4186 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S834
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits resale of non-prescription diabetes test devices by pharmacists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits resale of non-prescription diabetes test devices by pharmacists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted by S834
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S834 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-21-0)
S3403 (Carry Over) 2017-07-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback