NJ A4184 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of State Lottery to reduce advertising expenses for multi-state lottery games by sharing expenses with other participating states and to conduct evaluation of advertising expenses for State lottery games on annual basis.
Title
Requires Division of State Lottery to reduce advertising expenses for multi-state lottery games by sharing expenses with other participating states and to conduct evaluation of advertising expenses for State lottery games on annual basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (43-28-2) |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |