NJ A4183 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires additional data in annual temporary disability and family leave insurance reports.
Title
Requires additional data in annual temporary disability and family leave insurance reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-20-0) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2823 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee