NJ A4149 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-18 - Approved P.L.2013, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-18 - Approved P.L.2013, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New Jersey Racing Commission to grant special permit for horse racing on beach; allows wagering on such races.**
Title
Authorizes New Jersey Racing Commission to grant special permit for horse racing on beach; allows wagering on such races.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2899 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2899 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.163. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Motion To Suspend Rule 22:4 |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-2) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (37-1) (Norcross) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2899 (2R) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Norcross) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2892 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2899 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A4149 (2R)
S2899 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A4149 (2R)