NJ A4144 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurance producer licensing examination and registration materials to be offered in English and Spanish, and examination instructional materials to be available in Spanish.
Title
Requires insurance producer licensing examination and registration materials to be offered in English and Spanish, and examination instructional materials to be available in Spanish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2755 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.150. |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-12) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2755 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-16-3) |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2755 (Same As) 2015-09-24 - Substituted by A4144