NJ A4143 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2465 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2465 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Health Care Transparency Act."
Title
"New Jersey Health Care Transparency Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2465 (3R) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2465 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.133.