NJ A4127 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2614
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases civil penalties for certain natural gas or hazardous liquid facility safety violations.
Title
Increases civil penalties for certain natural gas or hazardous liquid facility safety violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4127 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2673 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2673 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee