NJ A2614 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases civil penalties for certain natural gas or hazardous liquid facility safety violations.
Title
Increases civil penalties for certain natural gas or hazardous liquid facility safety violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S679 |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S679 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.4.
A4127 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4127 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee