NJ A4113 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $1,393,084 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund to provide historic site management grants for certain historic preservation projects.
Title
Appropriates $1,393,084 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund to provide historic site management grants for certain historic preservation projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2788 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2788 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.134. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2788 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2788 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A4113