NJ A4086 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A673

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2532 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires correctional police officers receive 20 hours in-service training, including four hours in prevention of sexual misconduct, non-fraternization, and manipulation. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires correctional police officers receive 20 hours in-service training, including four hours in prevention of sexual misconduct, non-fraternization, and manipulation. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S2532 (1R)
2020-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4086 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2532 (1R)
S2532 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.410.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback