NJ S2532 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A673
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.410.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.410.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires correctional police officers receive 20 hours in-service training, including four hours in prevention of sexual misconduct, non-fraternization, and manipulation.*
Title
Requires correctional police officers receive 20 hours in-service training, including four hours in prevention of sexual misconduct, non-fraternization, and manipulation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4086 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.410. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4086 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Greenstein) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2532 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.410.
A4086 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2532 (1R)
A4086 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2532 (1R)