NJ A4084 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1656
Note: Carry Foward to future S3109
Note: Carry Over of previous A3010
Note: Carry Over of previous S1646
Note: Carry Foward to future S3109
Note: Carry Over of previous A3010
Note: Carry Over of previous S1646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits institution of higher education that provides child care from charging student-parent who receives child care voucher under "New Jersey Cares for Kids Program" an amount for child care in excess of voucher amount.
Title
Prohibits institution of higher education that provides child care from charging student-parent who receives child care voucher under "New Jersey Cares for Kids Program" an amount for child care in excess of voucher amount.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4084 (Carry Over) 2022-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4084 (Carry Over) 2022-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2403 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3010 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1646 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4084 (Carry Over) 2022-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2403 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3010 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1646 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4084 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4500/4084_I1.HTM |