NJ A407 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of wireless telephones or electronic communication devices by operators of public transit vehicles in certain situations. *
Title
Prohibits use of wireless telephones or electronic communication devices by operators of public transit vehicles in certain situations. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Approved P.L.2011, c.5. | |
2010-12-13 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-1) | |
2010-10-18 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-10-18 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-10-18 | Substituted for S732 (2R) | |
2010-09-30 | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Sacco) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S732 (Same As) 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A407 (2R)