NJ A4055 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-15)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Approved P.L.2011, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-15)
Status: Passed on August 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-04 - Approved P.L.2011, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2012.
Title
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-04 | Approved P.L.2011, c.93. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for S2911 | |
2011-06-23 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-23 | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2911 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A4055