NJ A4041 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1829
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions of the "New Jersey False Claims Act" retroactive under certain circumstances.
Title
Makes provisions of the "New Jersey False Claims Act" retroactive under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-27-2) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4041 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2645 (Same As) 2014-12-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2645 (Same As) 2014-12-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee