NJ A4035 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to sell as surplus property certain land and improvements in Morris County known as Central Park School.
Title
Requires State to sell as surplus property certain land and improvements in Morris County known as Central Park School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2809 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2809 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2809 (1R) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2809 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by A4035 (2R)