NJ A4008 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A561
Note: Carry Foward to future S1513
Note: Carry Foward to future S1513
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides secondary classroom experience credit towards meeting requirements of classroom training portion of registered apprenticeship.
Title
Provides secondary classroom experience credit towards meeting requirements of classroom training portion of registered apprenticeship.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4008 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4008 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3585 (Same As) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4008 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3585 (Same As) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading