NJ A4007 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2369
Note: Carry Foward to future S331
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Note: Carry Foward to future S331
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires environmental sustainability plan for State House Complex.
Title
Requires environmental sustainability plan for State House Complex.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4007 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4007 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2292 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2922 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4007 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2292 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2922 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee