NJ A4003 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S354
Note: Carry Over of previous A3578
Note: Carry Over of previous A3578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes School Funding Formula Evaluation Task Force.
Title
Establishes School Funding Formula Evaluation Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1986 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S354 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3578 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S354 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3578 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4003 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4003_I1.HTM |