NJ A4 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Economic Recovery Act of 2020"; provides for administration of programs and policies related to jobs, property development, food deserts, community partnerships, small and early stage businesses, State procurement, wind energy, and film production, and makes an appropriation.
Title
"New Jersey Economic Recovery Act of 2020"; provides for administration of programs and policies related to jobs, property development, food deserts, community partnerships, small and early stage businesses, State procurement, wind energy, and film production, and makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3295 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.156. |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (22-15) (Weinberg) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Motion To Sa (O'Scanlon) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted for S3295 (1R) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-11-0) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (51-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-12-21 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (DiMaso) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3295 (Same As) 2020-12-21 - Substituted by A4 (1R)