NJ A3975 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.37.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law concerning family leave, temporary disability and family temporary disability leave, and domestic or sexual violence safety leave.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law concerning family leave, temporary disability and family temporary disability leave, and domestic or sexual violence safety leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2528 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.37.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-18-2)
2019-01-31AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (26-12)
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted for S2528 (3R)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Amendment (28-3) (Diegnan)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-21-2)
2018-10-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-05-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2528 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A3975 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback