NJ A3963 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3078
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for receipts for applications for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
Provides for receipts for applications for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3963 (Carry Over) 2015-01-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2661 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2661 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee