NJ A3927 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires drivers to slow down before passing slow moving vehicles; establishes Statewide educational campaign on rural roadway safety; updates agriculture-related motor vehicle laws to reflect current industry practices.
Title
Requires drivers to slow down before passing slow moving vehicles; establishes Statewide educational campaign on rural roadway safety; updates agriculture-related motor vehicle laws to reflect current industry practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2820 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.292. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S2820 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2820 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3927